Financial history The Prayer and Prophetic Centre

Charity number: 1056589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £205.77k £72.41k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £218.76k £135.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £33.17k N/A N/A N/A