Accounts and annual returns CONSULTANCY COUNSELLING TRAINING AND LEADERSHIP (C.C.T.L)

Charity number: 1056658
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 June 2008 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required