Accounts and annual returns EVERTON LOWER SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1056684
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 10 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 23 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 04 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required