Financial history BRENT INDIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1056710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.97k £3.64k £23.92k £25.60k £20.27k
Total expenditure £12.41k £4.15k £16.72k £20.45k £28.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.18k