Accounts and annual returns WALTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE (WEST YORKSHIRE)

Charity Number: 1056742
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 26 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 12 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 20 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 10 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required