Accounts and annual returns THIRSK SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION FUND

Charity number: 1056839
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 19 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required