Financial history THE REG VARDY BAND

Charity Number: 1056924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.82k £11.00k £21.93k £14.49k £36.96k
Total expenditure £38.39k £5.71k £21.24k £29.07k £42.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.00k