Accounts and annual returns THE WAYFARERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1056928
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2014 13 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2013 25 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2011 22 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required