Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LISIECKI HOMES IN POLAND

Charity Number: 1057103
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 05 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 03 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2015 20 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2014 21 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not Required