Accounts and annual returns MIDLANDS EXCELLENCE

Charity Number: 1057144
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 24 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 17 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 23 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 December 2009 On Time