Accounts and annual returns VALUES INTO ACTION

Charity Number: 1057249
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 23 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 June 2011 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 14 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time