Financial history THE GAINES CHRISTIAN YOUTH CENTRE

Charity Number: 1057267
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £187.13k £233.54k £109.06k £10.58k £350
Total expenditure £222.09k £217.24k £168.09k £44.79k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A