Financial history HORSE OF THE DESERT TRUST

Charity number: 1057314
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £77 £79 £76 £56 £58
Total expenditure £0 £50 £26 £0 £58
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A