Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF GWAUNMEISGYN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1057381
Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 September 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 September 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required