Accounts and annual returns BLAENAU GWENT OTTERS SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1057653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 March 2025 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 March 2025 721 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required