Accounts and annual returns DOWNHAM MARKET AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE 542

Charity number: 1057664
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 May 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 May 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 May 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 May 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2005 Not submitted