Financial history THE UNITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1057710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.22k £50.76k £18.89k £1.51k £16.62k
Total expenditure £16.48k £12.83k £32.43k £20.80k £13.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A