Financial history MEARS ASHBY C.E.PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1057716
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £9.13k £8.85k £8.38k £14.00k £7.81k
Total expenditure £7.81k £6.54k £5.90k £14.00k £8.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A