Accounts and annual returns CRAVEN ARMS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1057725
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 03 April 2012 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 16 February 2012 16 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 16 February 2012 381 days late