Financial history THE FRIENDS OF MOEL FINDEG

Charity number: 1057743
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £330 £108 £574 £586 £15
Total expenditure £784 £333 £3.57k £1.41k £10.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A