Accounts and annual returns THE LEGISLATION MONITORING SERVICE FOR CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THEIR ADVISERS

Charity number: 1057767
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 February 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required