Financial history BRIXTON SOCIETY

Charity number: 1058103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.73k £3.67k £4.94k £3.85k £3.37k
Total expenditure £8.21k £3.40k £4.36k £3.35k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A