Accounts and annual returns WOMEN IN EDUCATION NETWORK

Charity Number: 1058382
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 23 December 2008 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 19 January 2009 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 02 December 2008 824 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2004 16 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required