Financial history BUTTINGTON/TREWERN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1058383
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £12.31k £9.04k £24.39k £3.60k £17.79k
Total expenditure £13.72k £8.13k £5.12k £4.52k £6.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.00k N/A £2.10k