Accounts and annual returns SERVE ON RAPIER UK

Charity number: 1058653
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2016 28 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 28 November 2016 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2015 19 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2014 05 January 2015 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required