Financial history GILLAMOOR C.E. SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1058828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.67k £7.00k £7.25k £841 £9.00k
Total expenditure £1.24k £1.81k £585 £65 £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A