Financial history LIFE EDUCATION CENTRE FOR LANCASHIRE

Charity number: 1058867
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £249.36k £186.53k £246.14k £240.31k £260.03k
Total expenditure £218.67k £167.67k £207.81k £215.31k £256.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A