Accounts and annual returns RICHMOND ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1058961
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2004 18 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not Required