Accounts and annual returns PRESTON GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1058976
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 22 January 2008 356 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 17 January 2008 716 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 17 January 2008 1081 days late