Financial history CALVARY BELIEVERS MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1059080
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £57.75k £61.42k £40.44k £36.10k £41.05k
Total expenditure £42.03k £41.64k £24.68k £29.13k £44.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A