Accounts and annual returns BREAKSPEAR SCHOOLS PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059213
Charity reporting is overdue by 346 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 346 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 346 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 May 2024 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 15 May 2024 350 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window