Financial history THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARWICK-IN-ELMET TRUST

Charity number: 1059263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £7.87k £4.34k £2.65k £4.97k £6.06k
Total expenditure £6.27k £4.64k £3.13k £8.52k £13.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A