Financial history BLACKWELL SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15.08k £10.94k £3.99k £8.33k £12.11k
Total expenditure £9.01k £6.41k £8.15k £11.15k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A