Accounts and annual returns THE APOSTOLIC MINISTERIAL UNION

Charity Number: 1059350
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 19 August 2008 201 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required