Financial history LITTLE LEARNERS, WOOLWICH

Charity Number: 1059358
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £94.48k £161.40k £56.18k £114.37k £91.29k
Total expenditure £139.49k £148.36k £91.51k £125.55k £71.78k
Income from government contracts £86.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £158.35k N/A £102.33k £84.37k