Accounts and annual returns CHITRALEKA DANCE COMPANY

Charity number: 1059384
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 February 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 12 February 2025 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 November 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 26 November 2024 295 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 March 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window