Financial history THE SOLIHULL COLLEGE FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1059407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £1.29k £362 £862 £287 £0
Total expenditure £343 £298 £66.19k £156.59k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A