Financial history BISHOPSTON COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.58k £9.89k £11.61k £25.14k £21.99k
Total expenditure £12.15k £11.22k £12.24k £12.78k £16.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A