Accounts and annual returns THE RAINBOW PROJECT

Charity number: 1059564
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time