Financial history PRIORY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059566
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/03/2020 16/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.02k £17.10k £21.32k £36.48k £92.92k
Total expenditure £12.91k £9.24k £22.66k £40.78k £85.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £623 £10.00k £5.05k £22.00k £12.00k