Trustees ST GILES SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1059626

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Williams | Chair | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Roberts | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Kate Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren James Roberts | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Marie Burn | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Louise Dyfnallt | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline M Gardner | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.