Accounts and annual returns AZIMGHUR TOTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1059706
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 04 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 06 December 2010 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 02 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 02 September 2009 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted