Financial history THE OSMER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1059717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.71k £3.78k £4.20k £5.44k £5.56k
Total expenditure £6.70k £2.80k £2.50k £5.55k £5.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A