Financial history CYFEILLION MAES GARMON

Charity Number: 1059787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £22 £18 £20 £134
Total expenditure £473 £143 £128 £140 £153
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A