Financial history THE NATIONAL RETAIL PLANNING FORUM

Charity number: 1059869
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.43k £949 £8 £6 £6
Total expenditure £4.41k £5.54k £3.93k £1.69k £1.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A