Financial history THE MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF SALISBURY

Charity number: 1059944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.46k £63.43k £51.64k £72.21k £47.02k
Total expenditure £49.95k £37.30k £37.95k £40.55k £47.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £38.41k N/A N/A N/A