Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BECCLES AND DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Charity Number: 1060019

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Wheeler | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Lewis | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Coleman | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Webber | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patchett | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Harrison | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Reid | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Betts | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Andrew | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Arnold | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judy Labanc | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Bubb | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr GLENN WILLIAM COLLINS | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.