Accounts and annual returns FLORA FOR FAUNA LIMITED

Charity Number: 1060715
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 18 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 03 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 05 March 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2006 28 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 28 February 2007 On Time