Financial history FRIENDS OF MEYSEY HAMPTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1060888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/09/2020 21/09/2021 21/09/2022 21/09/2023 21/09/2024
Total gross income £5.56k £3.03k £10.64k £6.93k £9.69k
Total expenditure £5.78k £6.03k £3.59k £5.57k £16.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A