Financial history PROJECT CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1060934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £255.94k £395.93k £509.39k £609.98k £626.26k
Total expenditure £307.05k £279.80k £415.70k £523.15k £595.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £57.98k £64.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £545.89k £545.07k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £6.11k £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £16.44k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £415.70k £523.15k £595.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £2.11k £7.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0